RI S2982 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- LIFE INSURANCE POLICIES AND RESERVES - Replaces the term "the drug naloxone" with the term "opioid antagonist" in chapters regulating life insurance policies and group life insurance policies.
Title
Replaces the term "the drug naloxone" with the term "opioid antagonist" in chapters regulating life insurance policies and group life insurance policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |