RI S2980 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires educational institutions using dogs or cats for medical research to make animals no longer useful for research available for adoption.
Title
Disposition Of Research Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018) |