RI S2974 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Approves Warwick city charter amendments increasing mayor's term of office from 2 to 4 yrs, limited to 2 consecutive terms limiting council members to 6 consecutive 2 yr. terms effective 1/1/25 subject to general/special election voter approval.
Title
Relating To Authorizing The Amendment Of The Warwick City Charter Regarding New Elected Term Lengths And Term Limits For Mayor And Council Elective Terms Commencing January, 2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |