RI S2951 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires electrical work performed in state be in accordance with latest edition of NEC, that state building code standards committee adopt latest edition. Regulatory analysis for proposed rule would not apply to building, fire safety or electrical codes.
Title
State Building Code - Administration And Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |