RI S2937 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- MOTOR VEHICLE OFFENSES - Extends the "lookback" period for repeat offenses involving driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs under § 31-27-2 and for repeat offenses related to failure or refusal to submit to chemical tests under § 31-27-2.1 from five to ten years.
Title
Extends the "lookback" period for repeat offenses involving driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs under § 31-27-2 and for repeat offenses related to failure or refusal to submit to chemical tests under § 31-27-2.1 from five to ten years.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage As Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Approval Of Amendment (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2024) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |