RI S2923 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Meeting postponed (08/04/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Meeting postponed (08/04/2020)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes City of Providence to issue $140,000,000 in general obligation bonds to finance, improvements to school buildings and facilities.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Providence To Issue Not To Exceed $140,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 75% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Meeting postponed (08/04/2020) |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2923.pdf |