RI S2922 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Pawtucket to issue not more than $1,000,000 general obligation bonds, notes and other evidences of indebtedness to finance the construction, reconstruction and repair of bridges and all costs incidental or related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The City Of Pawtucket To Provide For The Construction, Reconstruction And Repair Of Bridges And All Costs Incidental Or Related Thereto And Authorizing The Financing Thereof, Including The Issue Of Not More Than $1,000,000 Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor, To Fund The Capital Improvement Program For The Two Fiscal Years 2020 And 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-21HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-14HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-06-06SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback