RI S2917 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cranston to issue not more than Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) general obligation bonds and temporary notes for the acquisition, ?equipping and installation of renewable energy and energy ?conservation improvements.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Acquisition, Equipping And Installation Of Renewable Energy And Energy Conservation Improvements That Reduce Energy Costs And/or Use Of Fossil Fuels In Public Buildings And Facilities In The City And All Attendant Expenses, Including But Not Limited To, Engineering Costs By The Issuance Of Not More Than $5,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020) |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |