RI S2914 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Issue Not To Exceed $147,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Issue Not To Exceed $147,000,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Landscaping, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The City, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 50% At The Time Of Issuance And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By The Amount Of Certain Grants Received From State Bond Proceeds, From The Rhode Island Department Of Education Or From The Rhode Island School Building Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/13/2020) |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |