RI S2914 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Cumberland to issue two million five hundred thousand dollars ($2,500,000) of the general obligation bonds and notes in order to finance street pavement improvements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Cumberland, With The Approval Of The Qualified Electors, To Issue General Obligation Bonds And/or Notes In An Amount Not To Exceed $2,500,000 For Street Pavement Improvements In The Town

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - General obligation bonds (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-22HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-07HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-06-06SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback