RI S2909 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Submits 2018 capital development program requesting the issuance of $375,500,000 in general obligation bonds to the voters for approval at the November 6, 2018, general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2018 Bond Referenda

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-31SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback