RI S2907 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires RIPTA to hold public hearing at least 30 days prior any bus route change in the affected neighborhood and provide a neighborhood impact statement to local and state officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Transit Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-22HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-08HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-06-07SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-05SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/07/2018)
2018-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback