RI S2905 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Corrects the law reflecting the relocation space for veterans' organizations to the William F. Powers Building and adds additional chartered veterans' organizations to the list of veterans' groups who are serviced.
Title
Relating To Military Affairs And Defense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2016) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/13/2016) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |