RI S2903 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables Rhode Island licensed new motor vehicle dealers to conduct vehicle identification number inspections.
Title
Certificates Of Title And Security Interests
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2903.pdf |