RI S2902 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - House passed as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-16 - House passed as amended in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish, And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (change The Name Of The State)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish, And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution Of The State (change The Name Of The State)
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - - change the name of the state approval of amendment lc 005438/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - - change the name of the state approval of amendment lc 005438/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |