RI S2892 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT - Prohibits use of algorithm or artificial intelligence to set residential rental amounts and prohibits landlord price fixing of residential rents. Violations constitute a deceptive trade practice and violators are subject to civil suit.
Title
Prohibits use of algorithm or artificial intelligence to set residential rental amounts and prohibits landlord price fixing of residential rents. Violations constitute a deceptive trade practice and violators are subject to civil suit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2892.pdf |