RI S2886 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows private employers to adopt an employment policy that provides a preference in hiring or promotion, or both, to a veteran.
Title
Employment Of Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/13/2016) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |