RI S2875 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Mariners Memorial Foundation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Mariners Memorial Foundation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-05SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-05HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-20HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-05-09HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-08SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/08/2018)

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback