RI S2871 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt from taxation the real and personal property located, in the City of Cranston, of the Comprehensive Community Action Program, Inc.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Property subject to taxation approval of amendment lc 5320/2 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |