RI S2870 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prevents credit history or score from being used to determine insurance rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Rates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-29SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-22SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/22/2018)
2018-05-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback