RI S2870 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-29 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts fire districts with no tax and/or policy making authority from certain posting requirements of the open meetings act.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/28/2016) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |