RI S2867 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Task Force To Review And Provide Recommendations On Policies Pertaining To The Rhode Island Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights (leobor) (creates A 13 Member Task Force To Study And Provide Recommendations On Policies Pertaining To The Ri Law Enforcement Officers’ Bill Of Rights, And Who Would Report Back To The Senate By February 9, 2021, And Expires On May 9, 2021.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Task Force To Review And Provide Recommendations On Policies Pertaining To The Rhode Island Law Enforcement Officers' Bill Of Rights (leobor) (creates A 13 Member Task Force To Study And Provide Recommendations On Policies Pertaining To The Ri Law Enforcement Officers’ Bill Of Rights, And Who Would Report Back To The Senate By February 9, 2021, And Expires On May 9, 2021.)
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |