RI S2863 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Middletown to issue up to $5,000,000 in bonds/notes to acquire/preserve open space/restore improve recreational areas subject to voter appeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing The Town Of Middletown To Finance Acquiring And Preserving Open Space And Acquiring, Preserving, Restoring And Improving Recreational Areas In The Town By The Issuance Of Not More Than $5,000,000 Bonds And/or Notes Therefor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-27SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2020-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-06-18HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2020-06-18HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020)
2020-06-18SenateSenate read and passed
2020-06-16SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020)
2020-06-16SenateCommittee recommends passage
2020-06-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2020)
2020-06-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback