RI S2863 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the general assembly elections in the risk-limiting audits within the jurisdiction of the board of elections.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2863.pdf |