RI S2859 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires health insurers, nonprofit hospital service corporations, nonprofit medical service corporations and health maintenance organizations that issue policies that provide coverage for prescription drugs and use step therapy protocols.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies - Step Therapy Protocol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-12SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-05-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback