RI S2857 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the number of years that the town of West Greenwich may enter into tax stabilization agreements from ten (10) to twelve (12).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-05-29SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback