RI S2855 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Temporarily expands incentives to enhance the school housing aid ratio to encourage new school and renovation projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To School Construction And Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback