RI S2852 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates insurance policies, provides coverage to diagnose & treat infertility for women between 25 & 42 years, including pre-implantation genetic diagnosis (PGD) in conjunction with in vitro fertilization (IVF).
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |