RI S2851 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires sealers of weights and measures appointed by the cities and towns to receive the same fees as charged by the sealers who perform the same inspecting/testing services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Produce Scales In Markets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-17SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/17/2018)
2018-05-10SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2018)
2018-05-03SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback