RI S2847 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends procedures regarding local liquor license appeals.
Title
Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-31 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |