RI S2845 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Portsmouth to issue bonds and notes to finance the construction, additions, renovation, improvement, alteration, repair, furnishing and equipping of schools and school facilities throughout the town.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of Portsmouth To Issue Not To Exceed $65,900,000 General Obligation Bonds, Notes And Other Evidences Of Indebtedness To Finance The Construction, Additions, Renovation, Improvement, Alteration, Repair, Furnishing And Equipping Of Schools And School Facilities Throughout The Town, Subject To Approval Of State Housing Aid At A Reimbursement Rate Or State Share Ratio Of Not Less Than 35% For Expenditures Eligible For State Aid And Provided That The Authorization Shall Be Reduced By Any Grant Received From The School Building Authority Capital Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-07-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/14/2020) |
2020-06-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2020) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |