RI S2811 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - Referred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- COASTAL RESOURCES MANAGEMENT COUNCIL - Provides that the legislature would be the body that negotiates on behalf of the state for all activities occurring in, on and over state submerged land extending beyond twenty-five (25) acres.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the legislature would be the body that negotiates on behalf of the state for all activities occurring in, on and over state submerged land extending beyond twenty-five (25) acres.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07HouseReferred to House State Government & Elections
2024-06-06SenateSenate passed Sub A
2024-06-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2024)
2024-06-04SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2024-06-03SenateProposed Substitute
2024-05-31SenateScheduled for consideration (06/04/2024)
2024-04-03SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-03-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024)
2024-03-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback