RI S2798 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- PRODUCER LICENSING ACT - Amends provisions re insurance producer appointments and clarifies language re insurance claims adjusters. Amends the RI life & health guarantee assoc act. Adds insurance data security and pet insurance acts and unfair discrimination prohibitions.
Title
Amends provisions re insurance producer appointments and clarifies language re insurance claims adjusters. Amends the RI life & health guarantee assoc act. Adds insurance data security and pet insurance acts and unfair discrimination prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage of Sub A (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Indefinite postponement (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |