RI S2794 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends a number of provisions in the general laws relative to financial institutions by eliminating unnecessary requirements and/or clarifying language in order to reduce certain burdens on businesses operating in Rhode Island.
Title
Creation And Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |