RI S2788 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds advanced recycling as a definition for refuse disposal. Adds the advanced recycling facility that means a facility that receives, stores and converts post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks using advanced recycling.
Title
Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |