RI S2788 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 19 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Charlestown, by ordinance, to offer tax dollar credit reductions in lieu of various tax exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation--town Of Charlestown

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/14/2018)
2018-05-03HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-05-02SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback