RI S2785 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes state to seek waiver of ACA to allow qualified small business owners/sole properties to purchase small group health insurance on cost/impact assessment by OHIC provide coverage for essential health benefit categories/services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual Health Insurance Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Insurance coverage approval of amendment (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-06-14SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-06SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-31SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-05-31SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-04-26SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback