RI S2784 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for physician/patient discussion regarding addiction and alternate treatment prior to initial and third opioid prescription.
Title
Uniform Control Substance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2784.pdf |