RI S2781 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Meeting postponed (05/01/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Meeting postponed (05/01/2014)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Supporting And Commending The Dedicated Work Of Family Caregivers
Title
Senate Resolution Supporting And Commending The Dedicated Work Of Family Caregivers
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/01/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2781.pdf |