RI S2777 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of dogs until fully weaned unless approval for sale in writing is obtained from a licensed veterinarian. Violations are punishable by imprisonment not to exceed 12 months or $1,000, or both. Pounds and shelters are exempt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee transferred to House Judiciary
2018-05-31HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-30SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback