RI S2775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the criminal penalties for wage theft and employee misclassification.
Title
Payments Of Wages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/05/2022) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |