RI S2774 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies current procedures for the application and collection of court costs, fees and assessments in all criminal matters.
Title
Probation And Parole Support Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |