RI S2774 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Low And Moderate Income Housing (would Extend The Reporting Date Of The "housing Act Of 2004 Implementation Oversight Commission From February 15, 2010 To February 15, 2011 And The Expiration Date From March 31, 2010 To March 31, 2011)
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities - Low And Moderate Income Housing (would Extend The Reporting Date Of The "housing Act Of 2004 Implementation Oversight Commission From February 15, 2010 To February 15, 2011 And The Expiration Date From March 31, 2010 To March 31, 2011)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-02 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-12 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2010-05-11 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2774.pdf |