RI S2773 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-13 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY -- BY POSSESSION AND PRESCRIPTION - Denies the right of footway, except within one hundred (100) yards of the Pawtuxet River in the cities of Warwick and Cranston and except in connection with a right to pass with carriages to be acquired by prescription or adverse use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Denies the right of footway, except within one hundred (100) yards of the Pawtuxet River in the cities of Warwick and Cranston and except in connection with a right to pass with carriages to be acquired by prescription or adverse use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13SenateSenate read and passed
2024-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024)
2024-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage
2024-06-11SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2024)
2024-04-23SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2024-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024)
2024-03-08SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback