RI S2773 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables municipalities to create tourism improvement districts to increase economic activity in the tourism industry.
Title
Tourism Improvement Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |