RI S2763 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the use of an electronic means of transmission of the medical certificate required for issuance of a CDL by the division of motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Driver's License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-29HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-26HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-04-25SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-11SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
2018-04-04SenateCommittee recommended indefinite postponement
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback