RI S2760 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the motion picture production company tax credit to ten million dollars ($10,000,000) and cap the available total of credits to forty million dollars ($40,000,000). This act would also eliminate the sunset provision.
Title
Motion Picture Production Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2022) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |