RI S2754 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Effective July 1, 2022, entitles environmental police officers to the benefits provided by chapter 45-21.2 entitled "Optional retirement for members of police force and firefighters."
Title
Retirement System -- Contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2754.pdf |