RI S2749 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Meeting postponed (04/11/2024)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Meeting postponed (04/11/2024)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Amend The Medicaid Section 1115 Demonstration Waiver Requests And Renewals (approves An Amendment To A Medicaid Section 1115 Demonstration Waiver To Mandate That The Eohhs Propose A 13% Raise To Provider Reimbursement Rates For Immediate Care Facilities, Including Certified Community Behavioral Health Centers.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION TO AMEND THE MEDICAID SECTION 1115 DEMONSTRATION WAIVER REQUESTS AND RENEWALS (Approves an amendment to a Medicaid section 1115 demonstration waiver to mandate that the EOHHS propose a 13% raise to provider reimbursement rates for immediate care facilities, including certified community behavioral health centers.)
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2749.pdf |