RI S2747 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island global warming solutions act to reduce carbon emissions across various sectors of the local economy.
Title
Rhode Island Global Warming Solutions Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (05/30/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2747.pdf |